TN SB0305 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-19 - Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/23/2024
Pending: Senate Finance, Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, requires the speakers of the senate and house of representatives to appoint the members of the advisory task force to review the composition of judicial districts by January 1, 2025, rather than July 1, 2025. - Amends TCA Title 8; Title 16; Title 17 and Title 18.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 8; Title 16; Title 17 and Title 18, relative to judicial districts.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2024-04-19SenatePlaced on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/23/2024
2024-04-11SenatePlaced on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/15/2024
2024-04-01SenateRecommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 6, Nays 1 PNV 1
2024-03-27SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/1/2024
2023-03-22SenateAction deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/28/2023
2023-03-22SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/22/2023
2023-03-21SenateAction deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 1/23/2024
2023-03-15SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/21/2023
2023-01-24SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
2023-01-21SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2023-01-20SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB1350 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-02 - Assigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback