TN SB0301 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-03 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-03 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, allows electric cooperatives to provide broadband internet access and related services without any limitations that are not otherwise placed on other private providers of telecommunication services. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 6; Title 7; Title 10; Title 65; Title 67 and Title 68.
Title
As introduced, allows electric cooperatives to provide broadband internet access and related services without any limitations that are not otherwise placed on other private providers of telecommunication services. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 6; Title 7; Title 10; Title 65; Title 67 and Title 68.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-03 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 4/3/2017 |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 4/4/2017 |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/28/2017 |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0950 (Crossfiled) 2018-01-17 - Sponsor change.