TN SB0296 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-26 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce & Labor Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-26 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce & Labor Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, increases, from 60 to 75 days after the close of the fiscal year, the period of time within which the department of health must submit an annual report to the governor and members of the general assembly detailing the operations, expenditures of funds, statistics, and rules under the Medical Assistance Act of 1968. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 33; Title 56 and Title 71.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4; Title 33; Title 56 and Title 71, relative to medical assistance.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-26 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce & Labor Committee |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0351 (Crossfiled) 2021-02-10 - P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.