TN SB0287 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-02-11 - P2C, ref. to S. Jud Comm.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-02-11 - P2C, ref. to S. Jud Comm.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, extends the time period within which a seized firearm may be sold at auction pursuant to court order from six to 12 months. - Amends TCA Title 38, Chapter 2; Title 39, Chapter 11, Part 6; Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 13 and Title 70.
Title
As introduced, extends the time period within which a seized firearm may be sold at auction pursuant to court order from six to 12 months. - Amends TCA Title 38, Chapter 2; Title 39, Chapter 11, Part 6; Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 13 and Title 70.
Sponsors
Sen. Diane Black [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-02-11 | P2C, ref. to S. Jud Comm. | |
2009-02-09 | Intro., P1C. | |
2009-02-06 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB0796 (Crossfiled) 2009-02-18 - Assigned to s/c Criminal Practice and Procedure of JUD
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB0287&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/SB0287.pdf |