TN SB0282 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 4 2022 - 75% progression
Action: 2022-05-18 - Transmitted to Governor for action.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, requires hearings for salary disputes to be set within 90 days; limits use of discovery during dispute proceedings; limits attorneys' fees for such petitions. - Amends TCA Title 8, Chapter 20.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 8, Chapter 20, relative to the appointment of deputies and assistants.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-04-27 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Concur in House Amend# 2 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-25 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 79 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 1 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-05-18SenateTransmitted to Governor for action.
2022-05-17HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2022-05-12SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2022-05-04SenateEnrolled and ready for signatures
2022-04-27SenateConcurred, Ayes 29, Nays 0 (Amendment 2 - HA0917)
2022-04-27SenatePlaced on Senate Message Calendar 2 for 4/27/2022
2022-04-25HousePassed H., as am., Ayes 79, Nays 13, PNV 0
2022-04-25HouseAm. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0836)
2022-04-25HouseH. adopted am. (Amendment 2 - HA0917)
2022-04-25HouseSubst. for comp. HB.
2021-04-01HouseRcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
2021-03-29SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2021-03-29SenatePassed Senate as amended, Ayes 26, Nays 0, PNV 4
2021-03-29SenateSenate adopted Amendment (Amendment 2 - SA0147)
2021-03-29SenateSenate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0131)
2021-03-25SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar for 3/29/2021
2021-03-24SenateRecommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 1 PNV 0
2021-03-23SenatePlaced on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/24/2021
2021-03-23SenateAction deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/24/2021
2021-03-16SenatePlaced on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/23/2021
2021-03-16SenateAction deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/23/2021
2021-03-09SenatePlaced on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/16/2021
2021-02-10SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
2021-02-08SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2021-01-21SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB1386 (Crossfiled) 2022-04-25 - Sponsor(s) Added.

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback