TN SB0275 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-09 - Pub. Ch. 278
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-09 - Pub. Ch. 278
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, enacts the "Uniform Foreign-Country Money Judgments Recognition Act." - Amends TCA Title 25 and Title 26.
Title
As enacted, enacts the "Uniform Foreign-Country Money Judgments Recognition Act." - Amends TCA Title 25 and Title 26.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-22 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Concur House Amendment # 1 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-09 | Pub. Ch. 278 | |
2019-05-09 | Effective date(s) 07/01/2019 | |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2019-04-24 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Concurred, Ayes 31, Nays 0 (Amendment 1 - HA0336) |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Message Calendar for 4/22/2019 |
2019-04-18 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 97, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2019-04-18 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0336) |
2019-04-18 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2019-02-28 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 30, Nays 0 |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Placed on Senate Floor Session calendar for 2/25/2019 |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 2/19/2019 |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1032 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-09 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 278