TN SB0235 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-01 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-01 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, exempts from the professional privilege tax physicians who are on inactive status and no longer earning income from the practice of medicine. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 4, Part 17.
Title
As introduced, exempts from the professional privilege tax physicians who are on inactive status and no longer earning income from the practice of medicine. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 4, Part 17.
Sponsors
Sen. Lee Harris [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-01 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee calendar for 3/1/2017 |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Refer to Senate Revenue Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0932 (Crossfiled) 2017-02-14 - Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee