TN SB0232 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-06-12 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. F,W&M Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-06-12 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. F,W&M Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, makes appropriations for the purpose of defraying the expenses of certain legislative enactments passed during the 2009 session of the 106th General Assembly.
Title
As introduced, makes appropriations for the purpose of defraying the expenses of certain legislative enactments passed during the 2009 session of the 106th General Assembly.
Sponsors
Sen. Joe Haynes [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-12 | Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. F,W&M Comm. | |
2009-02-11 | P2C, ref. to S. FW&M Comm. | |
2009-02-09 | Intro., P1C. | |
2009-02-05 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB0226 (Crossfiled) 2009-02-18 - Assigned to s/c Budget of FW&M
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB0232&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/SB0232.pdf |