TN SB0231 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-13 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. C&L Com.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-13 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. C&L Com.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, prohibits a county, municipality, or political subdivision of the state from adopting a wage theft ordinance or regulation that exceeds certain state and federal laws. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 8; Title 12, Chapter 4 and Title 50, Chapter 2.
Title
As introduced, prohibits a county, municipality, or political subdivision of the state from adopting a wage theft ordinance or regulation that exceeds certain state and federal laws. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 8; Title 12, Chapter 4 and Title 50, Chapter 2.
Sponsors
Sen. Brian Kelsey [R] | Rep. Mark White [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-13 | Senate | Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. C&L Com. |
2013-01-31 | Senate | P2C, ref. to S. C&L Comm. |
2013-01-30 | Senate | Intro., P1C. |
2013-01-29 | Senate | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB0208 (Crossfiled) 2013-02-04 - Assigned to s/c Local Government Subcommittee
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB0231&ga=108 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/108/Bill/SB0231.pdf |