TN SB0219 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-30 - Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-30 - Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires publication of the Tennessee Postsecondary Education Fact Book by March 1 each year instead of by March 15. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Title
As introduced, requires publication of the Tennessee Postsecondary Education Fact Book by March 1 each year instead of by March 15. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-27 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-30 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 30, Nays 0 |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0177) |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 3/27/2017 |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/22/2017 |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/15/2017 |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0360 (Crossfiled) 2017-04-11 - Failed in Education Administration & Planning