TN SB0216 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-18 - Comp. HB Subst (sends SB to dead bill file)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, extends the judicial performance evaluation commission, June 30, 2015. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29 and Title 17, Chapter 4.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, extends the judicial performance evaluation commission, June 30, 2015. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29 and Title 17, Chapter 4.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2013-04-18SenateComp. HB Subst (sends SB to dead bill file)
2013-04-17SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar 2 cal. for 4/18/2013
2013-04-10SenateRec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. Cal. Comm. Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
2013-04-03SenatePlaced on S. Govt. Ops. Comm. cal. for 4/10/2013
2013-04-03SenateAction Def. in S. Govt. Ops. Comm. to 4/10/2013
2013-03-27SenatePlaced on S. Govt. Ops. Comm. cal. for 4/3/2013
2013-03-27SenateAction Def. in S. Gov. Ops Comm. to 4/3/2013
2013-03-20SenatePlaced on S. Govt. Ops. Comm. cal. for 3/27/2013
2013-01-31SenateP2C, ref. to S. Govt. Ops. Comm.
2013-01-30SenateIntro., P1C.
2013-01-28SenateFiled for intro.

Same As/Similar To

HB0695 (Crossfiled) 2013-04-19 - Conf. comm. appointed. (Farmer, Lundberg, Stewart)

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback