TN SB0177 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-02 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-02 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, changes the date by which the bureau of workers' compensation must produce its report of all the employers that failed to obtain coverage or self-insure during the previous fiscal year from December 31 to December 15. - Amends TCA Title 50.
Title
As introduced, changes the date by which the bureau of workers' compensation must produce its report of all the employers that failed to obtain coverage or self-insure during the previous fiscal year from December 31 to December 15. - Amends TCA Title 50.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-02 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0157 (Crossfiled) 2017-02-03 - Assigned to s/c Consumer and Human Resources Subcommittee