TN SB0156 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 2 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-02 - Failed in Senate Education Committee - no motion
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 2 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-02 - Failed in Senate Education Committee - no motion
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires each LEA and public charter school to provide age-appropriate instruction to public school students in kindergarten through grade 12 on the events of September 11, 2001, annually on September 11. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 6.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 49, Chapter 6, relative to educational programs for students in kindergarten through grade twelve.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-02 | Senate | Failed in Senate Education Committee - no motion |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 2/2/2022 |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/31/2021 |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Education Committee to 3/31/2021 |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/17/2021 |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2021-01-15 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-01-14 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0149 (Crossfiled) 2021-03-25 - Received from House, Passed on First Consideration