TN SB0133 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-28 - Action Def. in S. S&L Govt. Comm. to 5/5/2009
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, requires the chief administrative officer of each entity subject to public records to inform employees and appointees about the requirements of state law concerning public records and the entities' policies for administering public records statutes. - Amends TCA Title 10.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, requires the chief administrative officer of each entity subject to public records to inform employees and appointees about the requirements of state law concerning public records and the entities' policies for administering public records statutes. - Amends TCA Title 10.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2009-04-28 Action Def. in S. S&L Govt. Comm. to 5/5/2009
2009-04-23 Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 04/28/2009
2009-02-11 P2C, ref. to S. S&L Govt. Comm.
2009-02-09 Intro., P1C.
2009-02-02 Filed for intro.

Same As/Similar To

HB0190 (Crossfiled) 2009-05-05 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Civil Practice and Procedure of JUD of Judiciary Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback