TN SB0131 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-24 - Action def. in S. Jud. Comm. to first cal of 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, requires notice of sales of confiscated firearms to be placed on Web site of county or municipality conducting such sale; requires such notice state that members of the public are invited to the sale. - Amends TCA Section 39-17-1317.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, requires notice of sales of confiscated firearms to be placed on Web site of county or municipality conducting such sale; requires such notice state that members of the public are invited to the sale. - Amends TCA Section 39-17-1317.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2011-03-24 Action def. in S. Jud. Comm. to first cal of 2012
2011-02-09 P2C, ref. to S. Jud Comm.
2011-02-07 Intro., P1C.
2011-01-25 Filed for intro.

Same As/Similar To

HB0164 (Crossfiled) 2011-02-09 - Assigned to s/c General Sub of Judiciary

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback