TN SB0128 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-01-19 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, extends the period, from 60 days before a general election to 60 days before a primary election, in which local governments and homeowners' associations are limited in the regulation of political campaign signs. - Amends TCA Section 2-7-143.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Section 2-7-143, relative to the Tennessee Freedom of Speech Act.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-01-19SenateWithdrawn.
2021-01-19SenateRecalled from Senate State & Local Government Committee
2021-01-15SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
2021-01-14SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2021-01-13SenateFiled for introduction

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback