TN SB0125 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-08 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-08 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, expands family life education throughout the state by requiring each LEA to develop, adopt, and implement a family life curriculum instead of only LEAs located in a county with a pregnancy rate that exceeds 19.5 pregnancies for every 1,000 females 15 through 17 years of age; prohibits a person from making abortion referrals or from advocating or encouraging abortion while present on school property. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 1; Title 49, Chapter 2; Title 49, Chapter 5 and Title 49, Chapter 6.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 49, Chapter 1; Title 49, Chapter 2; Title 49, Chapter 5 and Title 49, Chapter 6, relative to sex education.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-08 | Senate | Withdrawn. |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Recalled from Senate Education Committee |
2021-01-15 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2021-01-14 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-01-13 | Senate | Filed for introduction |