TN SB0122 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Pub. Ch. 289
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, extends the state unemployment compensation advisory council to June 30, 2023. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29 and Title 50, Chapter 7.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, extends the state unemployment compensation advisory council to June 30, 2023. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29 and Title 50, Chapter 7.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-22 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - Senate - SENATE GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-13 Pub. Ch. 289
2019-05-13 Effective date(s) 05/08/2019
2019-05-13 Signed by Governor.
2019-04-30SenateTransmitted to Governor for action.
2019-04-29HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2019-04-25SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2019-04-24SenateEnrolled and ready for signatures
2019-04-22HousePassed H., Ayes 93, Nays 0, PNV 1
2019-04-22HouseSubst. for comp. HB.
2019-03-21HouseRcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
2019-03-19SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2019-03-18SenatePassed Senate, Ayes 33, Nays 0
2019-03-15SenatePlaced on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 3/18/2019
2019-03-13SenateRecommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
2019-03-06SenatePlaced on Senate Government Operations Committee calendar for 3/13/2019
2019-01-30SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Government Operations Committee
2019-01-28SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2019-01-25SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0454 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-13 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 289

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback