TN SB0102 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, requires the bureau to implement a program to assist in the locating of missing, vulnerable citizens, called the Silver Alert program, that will supersede the Care Alert program. - Amends TCA Title 38, Chapter 6.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 38, Chapter 6, relative to the Silver Alert program.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-01-13SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
2021-01-12SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2021-01-11SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0119 (Crossfiled) 2021-03-03 - Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/10/2021

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback