TN SB0082 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Independent 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-19 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, requires certain out-of-state sellers to collect and remit state and local sales tax to the department of revenue; allocates portion of local sales tax from such sales to the county or city or town in which the purchaser resides. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 4, Part 32 and Title 67, Chapter 6.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, requires certain out-of-state sellers to collect and remit state and local sales tax to the department of revenue; allocates portion of local sales tax from such sales to the county or city or town in which the purchaser resides. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 4, Part 32 and Title 67, Chapter 6.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-19SenateAssigned to General Subcommittee of Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee
2019-03-12SenatePlaced on Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee calendar for 3/19/2019
2019-03-12SenateAction deferred in Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee to 3/19/2019
2019-03-05SenatePlaced on Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee calendar for 3/12/2019
2019-02-05SenateRefer to Senate F,W&M Revenue Subcommittee
2019-01-30SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2019-01-28SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2019-01-24SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0733 (Crossfiled) 2019-03-13 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways, and Means Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback