TN SB0077 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-17 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-17 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, allows certain persons employed by a local education agency as a faculty or staff member at a K-12 school to possess and carry a firearm. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 13 and Title 49, Chapter 6.
Title
As introduced, allows certain persons employed by a local education agency as a faculty or staff member at a K-12 school to possess and carry a firearm. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 13 and Title 49, Chapter 6.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-17 | Senate | Withdrawn. |
2014-04-17 | Senate | Recalled from S. Jud. Comm. |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. Jud Comm. |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 4/9/2013 |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 3/19/2013 |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 3/12/2013 |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 3/12/2013 |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 3/5/2013 |
2013-01-30 | Senate | P2C, ref. to S. Jud Comm. |
2013-01-28 | Senate | Intro., P1C. |
2013-01-18 | Senate | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB0633 (Crossfiled) 2013-03-27 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee of Civil Justice Committee
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB0077&ga=108 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/108/Bill/SB0077.pdf |