TN SB0076 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-27 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 178
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-27 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 178
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, consolidates annual reports on foster children and child care agencies into a comprehensive annual report made by the department; removes reporting requirement concerning shifting responsibility for foster children who move from one placement to another within the county probation department or children's services department. - Amends TCA Section 37-2-205; Section 37-2-411 and Section 37-5-519.
Title
As enacted, consolidates annual reports on foster children and child care agencies into a comprehensive annual report made by the department; removes reporting requirement concerning shifting responsibility for foster children who move from one placement to another within the county probation department or children's services department. - Amends TCA Section 37-2-205; Section 37-2-411 and Section 37-5-519.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-06 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-31 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-31 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-27 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 178 | |
2015-04-06 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 calendar for 4/6/2015 |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/31/2015 |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/31/2015 |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/24/2015 |
2015-01-27 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2015-01-27 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2015-01-17 | Senate | Refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2015-01-17 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, held on desk pending committee appointments. |
2015-01-16 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2015-01-16 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2015-01-15 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0066 (Crossfiled) 2015-04-27 - Pub. Ch. 178