TN SB0065 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-03 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Transportation and Safety Committee
Pending: Senate Transportation and Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-03 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Transportation and Safety Committee
Pending: Senate Transportation and Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, authorizes Shelby County to establish an independent center for driver license reinstatement. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 5; Title 6; Title 7 and Title 55, Chapter 50.
Title
As introduced, authorizes Shelby County to establish an independent center for driver license reinstatement. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 5; Title 6; Title 7 and Title 55, Chapter 50.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-03 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Transportation and Safety Committee |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Placed on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 4/3/2019 |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Transportation & Safety Committee |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Transportation and Safety Committee |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0388 (Crossfiled) 2019-02-06 - Assigned to s/c Safety & Funding Subcommittee