TN SB0045 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Government Operations Committee
Pending: Senate Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, updates the name, from committee for purchase from the blind and other severely disabled to committee for providing competitive integrated employment for individuals with severe disabilities; extends the committee to June 30, 2026. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29 and Title 71, Chapter 4.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4, Chapter 29 and Title 71, Chapter 4, relative to the committee for providing competitive integrated employment for individuals with severe disabilities.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-01-13SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Government Operations Committee
2021-01-12SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2021-01-08SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0272 (Crossfiled) 2021-02-22 - Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback