TN SB0033 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-01 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-01 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, revises barbers' authorization to perform services in the residence of any person who is "actually ill" to authorize the performance of services in the residence of any person who is "suffering from actual illness or disability". - Amends TCA Title 62.
Title
As introduced, revises barbers' authorization to perform services in the residence of any person who is "actually ill" to authorize the performance of services in the residence of any person who is "suffering from actual illness or disability". - Amends TCA Title 62.
Sponsors
Sen. Lee Harris [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-01 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2017-01-12 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0031 (Crossfiled) 2017-03-21 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Business and Utilities Subcommittee of Business and Utilities Committee