TN SB0021 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-05 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-05 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, reestablishes the first portion of home value for which real property tax relief will be reimbursed to disabled veteran home owners from $100,000 to $175,000. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 5, Part 7.
Title
As introduced, reestablishes the first portion of home value for which real property tax relief will be reimbursed to disabled veteran home owners from $100,000 to $175,000. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 5, Part 7.
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Green [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-05 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 4/5/2017 |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 4/5/2017 |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 4/4/2017 |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State & Local Government Committee |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 2/21/2017 |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 2/14/2017 |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2017-01-12 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2017-01-11 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0023 (Crossfiled) 2018-01-17 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Local Government Subcommittee of Local Government Committee