TN SB0013 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on December 2 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-25 - Sponsor(s) Added.
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 2 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-25 - Sponsor(s) Added.
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, until July 1, 2027, lowers, from $500,000 to $100,000, the amount of the required capital investment to be made by a business engaged in an enterprise located in an adventure tourism district to qualify for a job tax credit; until July 1, 2027, reduces the minimum job creation threshold the business must meet to qualify for the tax credit from 20 jobs to 10 jobs, if located in a tier 3 enhancement county, and from 10 jobs to five jobs, if located in a tier 4 enhancement county. - Amends TCA Title 11, Chapter 11, Part 2 and Section 67-4-2109.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 11, Chapter 11, Part 2 and Section 67-4-2109, relative to adventure tourism districts.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-25 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-01-13 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-12-02 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0336 (Crossfiled) 2021-03-03 - Sponsor(s) Added.