TN SB0009 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-15 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-15 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, awards one hour of community service credit to recipients of the Tennessee Promise Scholarship who make a blood donation; requires TSAC to promulgate by rule the documentation required for a student to obtain community service credit for a blood donation. - Amends TCA Section 49-4-708.
Title
As introduced, awards one hour of community service credit to recipients of the Tennessee Promise Scholarship who make a blood donation; requires TSAC to promulgate by rule the documentation required for a student to obtain community service credit for a blood donation. - Amends TCA Section 49-4-708.
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Green [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-15 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 2/15/2017 |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Refer to Senate Education Committee |
2017-01-11 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, held on desk pending committee appointments |
2017-01-10 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2017-01-04 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0012 (Crossfiled) 2017-02-28 - Taken off notice for cal. in Education Administration & Planning