TN SB0009 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 23 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-23 - Pub. Ch. 403
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 23 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-23 - Pub. Ch. 403
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, certifies medication aides who may administer certain medications in nursing homes or assisted living facilities under the supervision of licensed nurses. - Amends TCA Title 63, Chapter 7, Part 1.
Title
As enacted, certifies medication aides who may administer certain medications in nursing homes or assisted living facilities under the supervision of licensed nurses. - Amends TCA Title 63, Chapter 7, Part 1.
Sponsors
Sen. Diane Black [R] |
Roll Calls
2009-04-13 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-23 | Pub. Ch. 403 | |
2009-06-23 | Effective date(s) 07/01/09 | |
2009-06-11 | Signed by Governor. | |
2009-06-02 | Transmitted to Gov. for action. | |
2009-06-02 | Signed by H. Speaker | |
2009-06-01 | Signed by S. Speaker | |
2009-05-29 | Enrolled and ready for signatures | |
2009-05-28 | Passed H., Ayes 67, Nays 23, PNV 4 | |
2009-05-28 | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 1 - HA0381) | |
2009-05-28 | Subst. for comp. HB. | |
2009-04-16 | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. | |
2009-04-13 | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House | |
2009-04-13 | Passed S. as am., Ayes 29, Nays 2, PNV 2 | |
2009-04-13 | S. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - SA0162) | |
2009-04-09 | Placed on Sen. Regular Calendar (1) cal. for 04/13/2009 | |
2009-04-01 | Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. Cal. Comm. Ayes 7, Nays 1 PNV 1 | |
2009-03-26 | Placed on S.GW,H&HR Comm. cal. for 04/01/2009 | |
2009-03-25 | Action Def. in S.GW,H&HR Comm. to 4/1/2009 | |
2009-03-19 | Placed on S.GW,H&HR Comm. cal. for 03/25/2009 | |
2009-02-09 | Ref. to S. GW,H&HR | |
2009-01-14 | P2C held on desk pending committee appointments | |
2009-01-13 | Intro., P1C. | |
2008-12-19 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1607 (Crossfiled) 2009-06-23 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 403