TN SB0008 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on November 21 2022 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-28 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 21 2022 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-28 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, increases the penalty for aggravated assault involving strangulation or attempted strangulation from a Class C felony to a Class B felony if the victim was pregnant at the time of the offense. - Amends TCA Title 39 and Title 40.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 39 and Title 40, relative to criminal offenses involving strangulation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-28 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/28/2023 |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/28/2023 |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/22/2023 |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/22/2023 |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/21/2023 |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2023-01-13 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2023-01-11 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, held on desk pending committee appointments |
2023-01-10 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2022-11-21 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0015 (Crossfiled) 2023-02-08 - Sponsor(s) Added.