TN HR0226 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-25 - Signed by H. Speaker
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-25 - Signed by H. Speaker
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Forest Chen, Prudential Spirit of Community Award
Title
Forest Chen, Prudential Spirit of Community Award
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-24 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-25 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2020-02-25 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2020-02-24 | House | Adopted, Ayes 95, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2020-02-21 | House | Intro., placed on H. consent cal. for 2/24/20 |
2020-02-18 | House | Filed for introduction |