TN HJR8003 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 66-20)
Status: Passed on October 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-26 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

Trooper Aaron Rumford

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A RESOLUTION to honor the memory of Trooper Aaron Rumford of the Tennessee Highway Patrol.

Sponsors

Rep. Michael Curcio [R]Rep. Mary Littleton [R]Rep. Dale Carr [R]Rep. Dan Howell [R]
Rep. Rebecca Alexander [R]Rep. Charlie Baum [R]Rep. Clark Boyd [R]Rep. Rush Bricken [R]
Rep. David Byrd [R]Rep. Scotty Campbell [R]Rep. Karen Camper [D]Rep. Michele Carringer [R]
Rep. Glen Casada [R]Rep. Scott Cepicky [R]Rep. Jesse Chism [D]Rep. John Clemmons [D]
Rep. Mark Cochran [R]Rep. Barbara Cooper [D]Rep. Tandy Darby [R]Rep. Clay Doggett [R]
Rep. Rick Eldridge [R]Rep. Jeremy Faison [R]Rep. Andrew Farmer [R]Rep. Bob Freeman [D]
Rep. Johnny Garrett [R]Rep. John Gillespie [R]Rep. Bruce Griffey [R]Rep. Rusty Grills [R]
Rep. Yusuf Hakeem [D]Rep. Mark Hall [R]Rep. G Hardaway [D]Rep. Torrey Harris [D]
Rep. Kirk Haston [R]Rep. David Hawk [R]Rep. Patsy Hazlewood [R]Rep. Esther Helton [R]
Rep. Gary Hicks [R]Rep. Tim Hicks [R]Rep. Jason Hodges [D]Rep. John Holsclaw [R]
Rep. Bud Hulsey [R]Rep. Chris Hurt [R]Rep. Darren Jernigan [D]Rep. Curtis Johnson [R]
Rep. Gloria Johnson [D]Rep. Kelly Keisling [R]Rep. Sabi Kumar [R]Rep. Justin Lafferty [R]
Rep. London Lamar [D]Rep. William Lamberth [R]Rep. Tom Leatherwood [R]Rep. Harold Love [D]
Rep. Susan Lynn [R]Rep. Eddie Mannis [R]Rep. Pat Marsh [R]Rep. Sam McKenzie [D]
Rep. Larry Miller [D]Rep. Bo Mitchell [D]Rep. Debra Moody [R]Rep. Jerome Moon [R]
Rep. Brandon Ogles [R]Rep. Jason Powell [D]Rep. Dennis Powers [R]Rep. Bob Ramsey [R]
Rep. Jay Reedy [R]Rep. Tim Rudd [R]Rep. Iris Rudder [R]Rep. Lowell Russell [R]
Rep. Cameron Sexton [R]Rep. Johnny Shaw [D]Rep. Paul Sherrell [R]Rep. Robin Smith [R]
Rep. Mike Sparks [R]Rep. Gregory Terry [R]Rep. Dwayne Thompson [D]Rep. Chris Todd [R]
Rep. Kevin Vaughan [R]Rep. Greg Vital [R]Rep. Todd Warner [R]Rep. Terri Lynn Weaver [R]
Rep. Mark White [R]Rep. Sam Whitson [R]Rep. Ryan Williams [R]Rep. John Windle [D]
Rep. Dave Wright [R]Rep. Jason Zachary [R]

Roll Calls

2021-10-20 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-19 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-10-26 Signed by Governor.
2021-10-22HouseTransmitted to Governor for his action.
2021-10-22SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2021-10-21HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2021-10-21HouseEnrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
2021-10-20SenateReceived from House, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
2021-10-20SenateConcurred, Ayes 28, Nays 0
2021-10-19SenatePlaced on Senate Consent Calendar for 10/20/2021
2021-10-19HouseEngrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
2021-10-19HouseAdopted, Ayes 87, Nays 0, PNV 1
2021-10-18HouseIntro., placed on H. consent cal. 10/19/21
2021-10-14HouseFiled for introduction

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback