TN HJR1253 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on June 7 2010 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-22 - Returned by Governor without signature.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on June 7 2010 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-22 - Returned by Governor without signature.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Commends the State of Arizona and its elected officials as it approaches its centennial celebration.
Title
Commends the State of Arizona and its elected officials as it approaches its centennial celebration.
Sponsors
Rep. Joe Carr [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-06-04 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO CONCUR (Y: 18 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-22 | Returned by Governor without signature. | |
2010-06-07 | Transmitted to Governor for his action. | |
2010-06-07 | Signed by S. Speaker | |
2010-06-07 | Signed by H. Speaker | |
2010-06-07 | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. | |
2010-06-04 | Concurred, Ayes 17, Nays 7 | |
2010-06-04 | Placed on Sen. Regular Calendar (1) cal. for 06/04/2010 | |
2010-06-03 | S. Reset on next cal. | |
2010-06-02 | Placed on Sen. Consent Calendar (1) cal. for 06/03/2010 | |
2010-06-02 | Placed on Sen. Consent Calendar (1) cal. for 06/02/2010 | |
2010-05-27 | Rcvd. from H., ref. to S. Cal. Comm. | |
2010-05-24 | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. | |
2010-05-24 | Adopted, Ayes 67, Nays 27 | |
2010-05-24 | Am. no. 1 tabled Ayes 54, Nays 43 | |
2010-05-17 | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 5/24/10 | |
2010-05-17 | Reset on reg cal. for 5/24/10 | |
2010-05-13 | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 5/17/10 | |
2010-05-13 | Reset on Reg cal. for 5/17/10 | |
2010-05-12 | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 5/13/10 | |
2010-05-12 | Objected to on Consent Calendar. | |
2010-05-12 | R/S Intro., placed on H. consent cal. #2 5/12/10 | |
2010-05-10 | Filed for intro. |