TN HJR1001 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 15-4)
Status: Passed on May 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-02 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

Calls on the U.S. Secretary of Transportation to revoke the September 7, 2011, acceptance letter regarding the X-Lite Flared Terminal and the X-Lite Tanget Terminal guardrails and to call for the removal of such guardrails from roads in the United States.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Calls on the U.S. Secretary of Transportation to revoke the September 7, 2011, acceptance letter regarding the X-Lite Flared Terminal and the X-Lite Tanget Terminal guardrails and to call for the removal of such guardrails from roads in the United States.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-23 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Concur (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-12 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-02 Signed by Governor.
2018-04-30HouseTransmitted to Governor for his action.
2018-04-30SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2018-04-27HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2018-04-27HouseEnrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
2018-04-23SenateConcurred, Ayes 29, Nays 0
2018-04-19SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/23/2018
2018-04-18SenateRecommended for concurrence by Senate Transportation & Safety Committee, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
2018-04-18SenatePlaced on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 4/18/2018
2018-04-18SenateRule #83(8) Suspended, to be heard in S. Transportation & Safety Comm. 4-18-18
2018-04-16SenateReceived from House, refer to Senate Transportation & Safety Committee
2018-04-12HouseEngrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
2018-04-12HouseAdopted, Ayes 94, Nays 0, PNV 0
2018-04-10HouseH. Placed on Consent Calendar for 4/12/2018
2018-04-10HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/10/2018
2018-04-10HouseRec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
2018-04-10HousePlaced on cal. Transportation Committee for 4/10/2018
2018-04-10HouseRec. for pass by s/c ref. to Transportation Committee
2018-04-04HousePlaced on s/c cal Transportation Subcommittee for 4/10/2018
2018-04-04HouseAssigned to s/c Transportation Subcommittee
2018-04-04HouseIntro., ref. to Transportation Committee
2018-04-03HouseApproved by Delayed Bills Comm.
2018-04-02HousePlaced on cal. Delayed Bill Committee for 4/3/2018
2018-03-28HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2018-03-27HousePlaced on cal. Delayed Bill Committee for 3/29/2018
2018-03-27HouseRef. to Delayed Bills Comm.
2018-03-27HouseFiled for intro.

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback