TN HJR0851 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-10 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-10 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Proposes an amendment to Article II, Section 28 of the Constitution of Tennessee to authorize the General Assembly to exempt historical properties from taxes on real property.
Title
A RESOLUTION to propose an amendment to Article II, Section 28, of the Constitution of Tennessee, relative to the taxation of historical properties.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-10 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2024-04-03 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/10/2024 |
2024-03-18 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-03-13 | House | Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee to Constitutional Amendment Calendar |
2024-03-06 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/13/2024 |
2024-02-07 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2024-02-01 | House | Intro., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2024-01-31 | House | Filed for introduction |