TN HJR0821 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-09 - Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
Pending: House Calendar and Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-09 - Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
Pending: House Calendar and Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
Urges U.S. Attorneys to pursue criminal charges against persons discharging firearms in violation of state or federal laws on the interstate system and other federal highways in Tennessee.
Title
Urges U.S. Attorneys to pursue criminal charges against persons discharging firearms in violation of state or federal laws on the interstate system and other federal highways in Tennessee.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-09 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2020-06-03 | House | Placed on cal. Judiciary Committee for 6/8/2020 |
2020-06-02 | House | Action def. in Judiciary Committee to 6/9/2020 |
2020-05-27 | House | Placed on cal. Judiciary Committee for 6/2/2020 |
2020-05-27 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Judiciary Committee |
2020-05-20 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 5/27/2020 |
2020-03-17 | House | Meeting Canceled |
2020-03-11 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/17/2020 |
2020-03-10 | House | Action Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 3/17/2020 |
2020-03-04 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/10/2020 |
2020-02-10 | House | Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2020-02-06 | House | Intro., ref. to Judiciary |
2020-02-05 | House | Filed for introduction |