TN HJR0804 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on February 14 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-14 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on February 14 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-14 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Judge Richard H. Dinkins
Title
A RESOLUTION to honor the memory of Judge Richard H. Dinkins of Nashville.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-05 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-31 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-31 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-14 | Signed by Governor. | |
2024-02-07 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2024-02-06 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2024-02-06 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Concurred, Ayes 33, Nays 0 |
2024-02-02 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar for 2/5/2024 |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Received from House, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2024-01-31 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2024-01-31 | House | Adopted, Ayes 90, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2024-01-31 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-01-29 | House | Intro., placed on H. consent cal. for 1/31/2024 |
2024-01-26 | House | Filed for introduction |