TN HJR0712 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-20 - H. subst. & concurred in SJR 736
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-20 - H. subst. & concurred in SJR 736
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Dave Hanson, Public Charter School Commission
Title
Dave Hanson, Public Charter School Commission
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-20 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-20 | House | H. subst. & concurred in SJR 736 |
2020-02-13 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar |
2020-02-12 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 2/13/2020 |
2020-02-05 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2020-01-29 | House | Placed on cal. Education for 2/5/2020 |
2020-01-22 | House | Intro., ref. to Education |
2020-01-21 | House | Filed for introduction |