TN HJR0704 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on June 7 2010 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-22 - Returned by Governor without signature.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on June 7 2010 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-22 - Returned by Governor without signature.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Expresses opposition to the institution of new federal review, oversight, or preemption of state health insurance laws, the creation of a federal health insurance exchange or connector, and the creation of a federal health insurance plan (public plan) option.
Title
Expresses opposition to the institution of new federal review, oversight, or preemption of state health insurance laws, the creation of a federal health insurance exchange or connector, and the creation of a federal health insurance plan (public plan) option.
Sponsors
Rep. Susan Lynn [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-06-03 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO CONCUR (Y: 24 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-25 - Senate - S. FW&M COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-25 - Senate - S. FW&M COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-22 | Returned by Governor without signature. | |
2010-06-07 | Signed by S. Speaker | |
2010-06-07 | Transmitted to Governor for his action. | |
2010-06-07 | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. | |
2010-06-07 | Signed by H. Speaker | |
2010-06-03 | Concurred, Ayes 24, Nays 4 | |
2010-06-02 | Placed on Sen. Regular Calendar (1) cal. for 06/03/2010 | |
2010-06-01 | Placed on Sen. Regular Calendar (1) cal. for 06/02/2010 | |
2010-05-27 | S. Reset on cal. for 6/2/2010 | |
2010-05-26 | Placed on Sen. Regular Calendar (2) cal. for 05/27/2010 | |
2010-05-25 | Rec. for concur by S. Comm ref to: S. Cal. Comm. | |
2010-05-25 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 05/25/2010 | |
2010-05-18 | Action def. in S. F,W&M Comm. to next cal. | |
2010-05-17 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 05/18/2010 | |
2010-04-15 | Rcvd. from H., ref. to S. F,W&M Comm. | |
2010-04-12 | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. | |
2010-04-12 | Adopted, Ayes 66, Nays 29, PNV 1 | |
2010-04-12 | Am. no. 1 tabled Ayes 57, Nays 41 | |
2010-04-08 | Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/12/2010 | |
2010-04-07 | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 04/08/2010 | |
2010-04-06 | Action Def. in Calendar & Rules Committee to 4/8/2010 | |
2010-04-01 | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 04/06/2010 | |
2010-03-30 | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee | |
2010-03-24 | Placed on cal. Commerce Committee for 03/30/2010 | |
2010-03-24 | Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Commerce Committee | |
2010-03-17 | Placed on s/c cal Industrial Impact of COM for 03/24/2010 | |
2010-02-17 | Action Def. in s/c Industrial Impact of COM to last calendar | |
2010-02-10 | Placed on s/c cal Industrial Impact of COM for 02/17/2010 | |
2010-02-10 | Assigned to s/c Industrial Impact of COM | |
2010-01-12 | Intro., ref. to Commerce Committee | |
2009-10-20 | Filed for intro. |