TN HJR0667 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-20 - H. subst. & concurred in SJR 694
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-20 - H. subst. & concurred in SJR 694
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
David A. North, Board of Trustees of University of Memphis
Title
David A. North, Board of Trustees of University of Memphis
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-20 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-20 | House | H. subst. & concurred in SJR 694 |
2020-02-13 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar |
2020-02-12 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 2/13/2020 |
2020-02-05 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2020-01-29 | House | Placed on cal. Education for 2/5/2020 |
2020-01-29 | House | Action Def. in s/c Education to 2/5/2020 |
2020-01-22 | House | Placed on cal. Education for 1/29/2020 |
2020-01-14 | House | Intro., ref. to Education |
2020-01-09 | House | Filed for introduction |