TN HJR0627 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-17 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-17 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
Lauren Elizabeth Burchell, Salutatorian, Ooltewah High School
Title
A RESOLUTION to honor and recognize Lauren Elizabeth Burchell, 2021 Salutatorian of Ooltewah High School.
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Carter [R] | Rep. Dan Howell [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-05 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR 2 PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR 2 PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-17 | Signed by Governor. | |
2021-05-14 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2021-05-12 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2021-05-12 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Concurred, Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 5/5/2021 |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Received from House, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2021-05-04 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2021-05-04 | House | Adopted, Ayes 90, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2021-05-04 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-05-04 | House | Sponsor change. |
2021-05-04 | House | Intro., placed on H. consent cal. #2 for 5/4/21 |
2021-05-04 | House | Filed for introduction |