TN HJR0587 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 24 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-09 - Returned by Governor without signature.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 24 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-09 - Returned by Governor without signature.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Recognizes the destructive and insidious nature of United Nations Agenda 21.
Title
Recognizes the destructive and insidious nature of United Nations Agenda 21.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-24 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO CONCUR (Y: 19 N: 11 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-03 - Senate - S. S&L GOVT. COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-15 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 72 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-15 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PREVIOUS QUESTION AS AMENDED MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 63 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-08 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Regular Calendar 1 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-06 - House - (VOICE VOTE) STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-29 - House - (VOICE VOTE) S&LG SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: State & Local Government Commit (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-04-03 - Senate - S. S&L GOVT. COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-15 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 72 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-15 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PREVIOUS QUESTION AS AMENDED MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 63 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-08 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Regular Calendar 1 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-06 - House - (VOICE VOTE) STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-29 - House - (VOICE VOTE) S&LG SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: State & Local Government Commit (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-09 | Returned by Governor without signature. | |
2012-04-25 | Transmitted to Governor for his action. | |
2012-04-24 | Signed by S. Speaker | |
2012-04-24 | Signed by H. Speaker | |
2012-04-24 | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. | |
2012-04-24 | Concurred, Ayes 19, Nays 11, PNV 3 | |
2012-04-24 | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 1 - SA1138) | |
2012-04-23 | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 4/24/2012 | |
2012-04-23 | S. Reset on cal. for 4/24/2012 | |
2012-04-20 | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 4/23/2012 | |
2012-04-19 | S. Reset on cal. for 4/23/2012 | |
2012-04-17 | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 4/19/2012 | |
2012-04-03 | Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. Cal. Comm. Ayes 6, Nays 3 PNV 0 | |
2012-03-28 | Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 4/3/2012 | |
2012-03-27 | Action Def. in S. S&L Govt. Comm. to 4/3/2012 | |
2012-03-21 | Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 3/27/2012 | |
2012-03-19 | Rcvd. from H., ref. to S. S&L Gov. Comm. | |
2012-03-15 | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. | |
2012-03-15 | Adopted as am., Ayes 72, Nays 23 | |
2012-03-15 | H. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - HA0792) | |
2012-03-08 | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/15/2012 | |
2012-03-07 | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/8/2012 | |
2012-03-06 | Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee | |
2012-02-29 | Placed on cal. State & Local Government Committee for 3/6/2012 | |
2012-02-29 | Rec. for pass. if am. by s/c ref. to State & Local Government Committee | |
2012-02-22 | Placed on s/c cal S&LG Subcommittee for 2/29/2012 | |
2012-01-31 | Assigned to S&LG Subcommittee | |
2012-01-23 | Intro., ref. to State & Local Government Committee | |
2012-01-19 | Filed for intro. |