TN HJR0542 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 12 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-12 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 12 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-12 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
American Heart Association Go Red for Women
Title
American Heart Association Go Red for Women
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-08 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-03 - Senate - SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommend for Concurrence, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-01-28 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-03 - Senate - SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommend for Concurrence, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-01-28 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-12 | Signed by Governor. | |
2016-02-10 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2016-02-08 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2016-02-08 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Concurred, Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 calendar for 2/8/2016 |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Recommended for concurrence by Senate Health and Welfare Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 2/3/2016 |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Rule #83(8) Suspended, to be heard in S. H&W Cal. 2/3/16 |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Received from House, refer to Senate Health & Welfare Committee |
2016-01-28 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2016-01-28 | House | Adopted, Ayes 90, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2016-01-28 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2016-01-27 | House | Intro., placed on H. consent cal. for 1/28/16 |
2016-01-27 | House | Filed for intro. |