TN HJR0539 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-30 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Finance Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-30 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Finance Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Proposes an amendment to establish a cap on the combined rate of state and local sales and use tax.
Title
Proposes an amendment to establish a cap on the combined rate of state and local sales and use tax.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-30 | Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Finance Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee | |
2012-04-23 | Placed on s/c cal Finance Subcommittee for 4/24/2012 | |
2012-04-20 | Placed on s/c cal Finance Subcommittee for next calendar | |
2012-04-11 | Action Def. in s/c Finance Subcommittee to Const. Am. Calendar | |
2012-04-04 | Placed on s/c cal Finance Subcommittee for 4/11/2012 | |
2012-04-04 | Action Def. in s/c Finance Subcommittee to Constitutional Am. Calendar | |
2012-03-28 | Placed on s/c cal Finance Subcommittee for 4/4/2012 | |
2012-03-28 | Action Def. in s/c Finance Subcommittee to 4/4/2012 | |
2012-03-21 | Placed on s/c cal Finance Subcommittee for 3/28/2012 | |
2012-03-21 | Action Def. in s/c Finance Subcommittee to 3/28/2012 | |
2012-03-14 | Placed on s/c cal Finance Subcommittee for 3/21/2012 | |
2012-03-07 | Action Def. in s/c Finance Subcommittee to 3/21/2012 | |
2012-02-29 | Placed on s/c cal Finance Subcommittee for 3/7/2012 | |
2012-02-22 | Action Def. in s/c Finance Subcommittee to 3/7/2012 | |
2012-02-15 | Placed on s/c cal Finance Subcommittee for 2/22/2012 | |
2012-02-01 | Action Def. in s/c Finance Subcommittee to 2/22/2012 | |
2012-01-25 | Placed on s/c cal Finance Subcommittee for 2/1/2012 | |
2012-01-24 | Assigned to s/c Finance Subcommittee | |
2012-01-12 | Intro., ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee | |
2012-01-11 | Filed for intro. |
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HJR0539&ga=107 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/107/Bill/HJR0539.pdf |