TN HJR0537 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-16 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-16 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Abigail Shores, Salutatorian, Heritage Christian Academy
Title
Abigail Shores, Salutatorian, Heritage Christian Academy
Sponsors
Rep. Susan Lynn [R] | Sen. Mark Pody [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-09 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-05 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-05 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-16 | Signed by Governor. | |
2017-05-15 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2017-05-12 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2017-05-12 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Concurred, Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar calendar for 5/9/2017 |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Received from House, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2017-05-05 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2017-05-05 | House | Adopted, Ayes 87, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2017-05-05 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-05-04 | House | Intro., placed on H. consent cal. for 5/5/17 |
2017-05-04 | House | Filed for intro. |