TN HJR0491 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-11 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-11 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Command Sergeant Major Dennis Floden
Title
Command Sergeant Major Dennis Floden
Sponsors
Rep. Joe Pitts [D] | Rep. Jay Reedy [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-08 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-11 | Signed by Governor. | |
2017-05-10 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2017-05-09 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2017-05-09 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Concurred, Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar calendar for 5/8/2017 |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Received from House, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2017-05-03 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2017-05-03 | House | Adopted, Ayes 91, Nays 0, PNV 1 |
2017-05-03 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-05-01 | House | Intro., placed on H. consent cal. for 5/3/17 |
2017-05-01 | House | Filed for intro. |