TN HJR0349 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-23 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-23 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Recognizes Mary Jane Savage for her many accomplishments in the world of dance and important contributions to her community through her Dance Divas ministry.
Title
Recognizes Mary Jane Savage for her many accomplishments in the world of dance and important contributions to her community through her Dance Divas ministry.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-23 | Signed by Governor. | |
2009-04-21 | Transmitted to Governor for his action. | |
2009-04-21 | Signed by S. Speaker | |
2009-04-21 | Signed by H. Speaker | |
2009-04-21 | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. | |
2009-04-20 | R/S Concurred, v.v. | |
2009-04-20 | Rcvd. from H., ref. to S. Cal. Comm. | |
2009-04-16 | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. | |
2009-04-16 | R/S Intro., adopted v.v. | |
2009-04-16 | Filed for intro. |
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HJR0349&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/HJR0349.pdf |