TN HJR0278 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-02 - Tabled.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-02 - Tabled.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Mark Pulliam
Title
A RESOLUTION to honor and commend Mark Pulliam for his dedication to the Republican Party.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-02 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR LAY ON THE TABLE MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 73 N: 13 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-02 | House | Tabled. |
2023-03-02 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2023-02-27 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/2/2023 |
2023-02-27 | House | Objected to on Consent Calendar. |
2023-02-23 | House | Intro., placed on H. consent cal. 2/27/2023 |
2023-02-22 | House | Filed for introduction |