TN HJR0178 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 6 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-19 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in: Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 6 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-19 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in: Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Dorothy N. "Dottie" Mann, State Forestry Commission
Title
Dorothy N. "Dottie" Mann, State Forestry Commission
Sponsors
Rep. Joe Pitts [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-19 | House | Taken Off Notice For Cal. in: Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee |
2013-03-13 | House | Placed on cal. Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee for 3/19/2013 |
2013-03-07 | House | Intro., ref. to Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee |
2013-03-06 | House | Filed for intro. |
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HJR0178&ga=108 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/108/Bill/HJR0178.pdf |