TN HJR0150 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 30 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-01 - Received from House, refer to Senate State & Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 30 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-01 - Received from House, refer to Senate State & Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Designates the Bible as the official State Book.
Title
A RESOLUTION to designate the Holy Bible as the official State book.
Sponsors
Rep. Jerry Sexton [R] | Rep. Terri Lynn Weaver [R] | Rep. Paul Sherrell [R] | Rep. Dennis Powers [R] |
Rep. Rusty Grills [R] | Rep. Mark Hall [R] | Rep. Kent Calfee [R] | Rep. Chris Hurt [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-29 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PREVIOUS QUESTION MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 70 N: 21 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 55 N: 28 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 55 N: 28 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-01 | Senate | Received from House, refer to Senate State & Local Government Committee |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-03-30 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2021-03-29 | House | Adopted, Ayes 55, Nays 28, PNV 7 |
2021-03-29 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-03-26 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-03-25 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/29/2021 |
2021-03-24 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/25/2021 |
2021-03-23 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2021-03-17 | House | Placed on cal. Naming & Designating for 3/23/2021 |
2021-03-16 | House | Action def. in Naming & Designating to 3/23/2021 |
2021-03-10 | House | Placed on cal. Naming & Designating for 3/16/2021 |
2021-03-01 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-02-25 | House | Intro., ref. to Naming & Designating |
2021-02-24 | House | Filed for introduction |